Trustees BOURNEMOUTH MUSIC COMPETITIONS FESTIVAL
Charity number: 284422

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Williams | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tina Reyes | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacky Thorne | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Southon | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon David Freeman | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenni French | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Hazel Bayliss | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WATERS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER STARK | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.