THE FRIENDS OF BATH CATS AND DOGS HOME, BATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to help animals in need throughout the UK, and in particular, animals at the Bath Cats and Dogs Home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 1982: Standard registration
- 04 March 2025: Funds received from 1191939 PAWS FOR A CAUSE
- THE FRIENDS OF BATH CATS AND DOGS HOME (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF CLAVERTON CATS AND DOGS HOME, BATH (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Christine Kent | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARY BUSH | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLEYANN TEAGUE | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ELIZABETH CREW | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA HURLEY | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA ANNE PEARCE | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.53k | £103.88k | £59.23k | £163.73k | £305.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.01k | £50.35k | £34.79k | £47.29k | £73.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2023 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2023 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION AND TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO ANIMALS AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL AMENITIES AND VETERINARY SERVICES AT THE CATS AND DOGS HOME AT CLAVERTON IN THE CITY OF BATH ("THE CATS AND DOGS HOME").
Area of benefit
BATH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Hantone Hill
Bathampton
BATH
BA2 6XD
- Phone:
- 01225 282645
- Email:
- cary@carybush.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window