THE PERSE SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association provides a framework of support for the school, parents and guardians, through social, educational and charitable events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Johanna Whelan Rodriguez | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacy Lynn Sinclair | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Warren | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Varsha Jagdale | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Elizabeth Colgan | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Qi Guo | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beauty Bapiro | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amritjot Kaur Jethwa | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Anne Murray | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.09k | £8.70k | £6.39k | £8.87k | £8.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.75k | £13.96k | £5.68k | £1.84k | £16.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED ON 11TH NOVEMBER 1981 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PERSE SCHOOL
HILLS ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8QF
- Phone:
- 07425212413
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window