THE MOSHAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 284448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Make donations to charitable and educational institutions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £66,989
Total expenditure: £146,945

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSHUA HALPERN Trustee 20 February 2024
SAMJO LIMITED
Received: On time
OIZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE T R HEILPERN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
AVIR CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SHAAREI TORAH BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: 46 days late
Samuel Halpern Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
LEA HALPERN Trustee
None on record
David Moses Halpern Trustee
THE JEWISH DAY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
M AND M FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.33k £51.21k £52.84k £57.22k £66.99k
Total expenditure £108.18k £75.89k £79.93k £143.67k £146.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 February 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HALPERNS
NEW RIVERSIDE
439 LOWER BROUGHTON ROAD
SALFORD
M7 2FX
Phone:
01617922626
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available