Financial history CLEVEDON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 284460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.08k £4.03k £13.25k £15.12k £23.30k
Total expenditure £17.91k £4.38k £11.06k £10.15k £13.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A