THE MENUHIN COMPETITION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preparations for the eighteenth Menuhin Competition to be held in Richmond 2020. The after-care of past prize-winners, as well as exploring possible venues for future competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 1982: Standard registration
- 11 December 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE YEHUDI MENUHIN INTERNATIONAL COMPETITION FOR YOUNG VIOLINISTS (Working name)
- THE YEHUDI MENUHIN INTERNATIONAL VIOLIN COMPETITION TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- YEHUDI MENUHIN YOUNG VIOLINISTS INTERNATIONAL COMPETITION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.89k | £134.93k | £134.73k | £32.99k | £17.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.32k | £224.81k | £228.16k | £112.27k | £90.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.13k | £11.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 34 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1982 AND AMENDED 11 MAY 1997, 10 JULY 2002 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF VIOLIN COMPETITIONS AND EDUCATIONAL MUSICAL CONCERTS, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1982).
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window