Governing document THE MENUHIN COMPETITION TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1982 AND AMENDED 11 MAY 1997, 10 JULY 2002 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF VIOLIN COMPETITIONS AND EDUCATIONAL MUSICAL CONCERTS, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1982).
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.