Financial history SOUTH EASTERN KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 284479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.25k £53.75k £6.35k £15.22k £13.48k
Total expenditure £33.30k £22.86k £5.12k £23.75k £16.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A