WOODMANCOTE AND BLACKSTONE PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 284503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Manage local playing field at Blackstone

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET ANNE PARNELL Trustee
None on record
CAROL MARY MITCHELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Beechings
Henfield
BN5 9XB
Phone:
01273494353
Website:

No information available