WILLINGALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the Village Hall in Willingale for physical exercise, recreation and social and educational activities for a diverse range of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 18 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Phillip Gordon | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mellows | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Calvy | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Wiessner | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Llyris Stebbings | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Brazier | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAWN STOKES | Trustee | 07 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.35k | £15.82k | £7.28k | £24.09k | £15.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.53k | £5.21k | £19.28k | £19.06k | £14.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.79k | N/A | £2.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 06/11/1937 AS AMENDED ON 29/12/1938 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/07/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF WILLINGALE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
WILLINGALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willingale Village Hall
The Street
Willingale
Willingale Green
ONGAR
CM5 0SN
- Phone:
- 01277896620
- Email:
- secretary.wvhc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
willingalevillage.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window