Governing document BRITISH ALLIANCE OF HEALING ASSOCIATIONS
Charity number: 284546

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF SPIRITUAL HEALING. 2. THE RELIEF OF SPIRITUAL HEALERS IN NECESSITOUS FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.