Accounts and annual returns SOUTHEND-ON-SEA ARTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 284587
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 February 2022 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required