WATERLOO ACTION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The relief of poverty, sickness and distress, the protection of health and the advancement of education (2) The provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare, such facilities being provided with the object of improving the conditions of life of the persons for whom they are primarily intended. Those persons having need of such
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
91 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 13 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Patrick Deane | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Austin Thomas | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Kennedy | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HAYWARD | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD SIMMONS | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER BERYL STILES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.24k | £150.40k | £114.94k | £157.43k | £171.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.81k | £162.47k | £153.68k | £170.70k | £186.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £84.56k | £19.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 22ND FEBRUARY 1989 AND 3 DECEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THEPERSONS FOR WHOM THEY ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED, THOSE PERSONS HAVING NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NORTHERN PARTS OF LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH AND SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
WATERLOO ACTION CENTRE
14 BAYLIS ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7AA
- Phone:
- 02072611404
- Email:
- wac.finance@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window