THE FLEET AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral Singing, choral workshops and performance of concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
69 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 August 1982: Standard registration
- THE FLEET CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL RICHARD JAMES HOWARD | Chair | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE PATRICIA CASS | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Palmer | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Vaire Cullum | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.97k | £2.14k | £18.70k | £54.26k | £22.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.03k | £1.99k | £18.71k | £58.19k | £20.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MAY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 08 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
FLEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Leawood Road
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 5AN
- Phone:
- 07392828200
- Email:
- richard.howard60@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window