THE BRITAIN-BURMA BUDDHIST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE BUDDHISM AND TO MAKE IT EASILY ACCESIBLE TO THE UK'S GROWING BURMESE COMMUNITY AND NON BURMESE BUDDHISTS SUCH AS THAIS, SRI LANKANS, ETC ANYONE INTERESTED IN BUDDHISM FOR SPIRITUAL AND MEDITATION ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 12 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
May Maung | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Myint | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ei Lin Khaing | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIN TIN LWIN | Trustee | 25 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Khin Gray | Trustee | 02 April 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £8.78k | £11.67k | £16.48k | £30.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.43k | £9.12k | £12.70k | £26.21k | £45.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2023 | 583 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JUNE 1981, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 29 DECEMBER 2005 AND MEMORANDUM OF AMENDMENT DATED 25 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BUDHIST RELIGION PRINCIPALLY AND ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO THE TRADITIONS OF THE TERAVADA SCHOOL OF BUDDIHISM AS FOLLOWED IN BURMA AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID MAIN OBJECT. (B) TO ESTABLISH A BUDDHIST CENTRE OR BUDDHIST CENTRES, INSTITUTIONS, MONASTERIES, NUNNERIES AND RETREATS IN THE UNITED KINGDON AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 OLD CHURCH LANE
LONDON
NW9 8TG
- Phone:
- 0208 200 6898
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window