LITTLETON UPON SEVERN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 284635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Hall maintenance and re-decoration; raise money for maintenance purposes and other charities; organise Village events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,338
Total expenditure: £11,499

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • North Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Peter Cooper Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Timothy Edward Pyper Trustee 17 April 2023
None on record
Sandra Mapstone Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Tracy Little Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Jeremy Charles Stanley Warren Trustee 05 April 2021
None on record
Cathy Darby Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Jane Williams Trustee 29 May 2018
None on record
Diana Bazeley Trustee 19 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.72k £23.69k £7.35k £4.83k £6.34k
Total expenditure £2.70k £8.09k £5.13k £12.27k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.77k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Northly Farm
Littleton-Upon-Severn
BRISTOL
BS35 1NS
Phone:
07773766607
Website:

No information available