ROTHERFIELD PEPPARD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives financial aid to young people up to the age of 25 in connection with educational activities. The charity operates only in the parish of Rotherfield Peppard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES STICKINGS | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Barbara Langdale | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Collison | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £390 | £311 | £359 | £296 | |
|
Total expenditure | £388 | £250 | £0 | £827 | £480 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 August 2024 | 454 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22ND JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN SUCH WAYS AS THEY THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS ROTHERFIELD PEPPARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
TWO MEADS
CHURCH LANE
ROTHERFIELD PEPPARD
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 5JN
- Phone:
- 01491628245
- Email:
- rpedu@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window