ROTHERFIELD GREYS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) Promoting education of persons under 25 who are resident in the area of benefit and who are in need of financial assistance. (2) Providing benefits not normally provided by the local education authority for any school in the maintained sector attended by children and young persons resident in the area. (3) Benefiting in such ways as the Trustees think fit any Sunday school in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD OVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
SAM SAMUELS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM ETHELSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £1.11k | £1.14k | £1.17k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN SUCH WAYS AS THEY THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. (SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS).
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS, ROTHERFIELD GREYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
COWFIELDS FARM
ROTHERFIELD GREYS
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 4PX
- Phone:
- 07720232222
- Email:
- samsamuels@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window