BRITISH CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE BCA RUNS AN ANNUAL SPRING MEETING AT WHICH RECENT DEVELOPMENTS IN THE SCIENCE OF CRYSTALLOGRAPHY ARE PRESENTED. A QUARTERLY NEWSLETTER IS PRODUCED WHICH IS SENT TO MEMBERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alexandra Gibbs | Chair | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lauren Hatcher | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzanna Ward | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Stares | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.61k | £42.39k | £11.79k | £133.90k | £200.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.99k | £51.27k | £108.85k | £112.87k | £195.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTES AND BY-LAWS ADOPTED 6TH APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE OF CRYSTALLOGRAPHY PARTICULARLY WITHIN THE BRITISH ISLES.
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Chase Ridings
Enfield
Middlesex
EN2 7QE
- Phone:
- 07790307052
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window