THE PLUMPTON COLLEGE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (INCORPORATING O.T. NORRIS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable as many students as possible to enjoy a fulfilling college experience and reach their full potential by raising funds to support activities which would otherwise be beyond college resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 May 1982: Standard registration
- O T NORRIS (Working name)
- OSWALD THOMAS NORRIS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Anthony Stanier | Chair | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Atkinson | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Desmond Lambert | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Howard Wood | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Knell | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY KERSWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE HOWE | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|||||
JEREMY COURTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £17.50k | £7.26k | £902 | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.67k | £9.15k | £16.84k | £1.18k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 AUGUST 1945, SCHEME DATED 18 MARCH 1981,RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 APRIL 2006 AND 27 MAY 2008, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PLUMPTON COLLEGE. GRANTS TOWARDS STUDENTS EDUCATIONAL TRIPS. GRANTS TOWARDS CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS AT PLUMPTON COLLEGE WHICH WOULD NOT NORMALLY BE COVERED BY GOVERNMENT FUNDING. GRANTS TO PLUMPTON COLLEGE TO ASSIST THE MARKETING OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AIMED AT HARD-TO-REACH PEOPLE SUCH AS BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC PEOPLE. GRANTS TO IMPROVE RESOURCES AT PLUMPTON COLLEGE. GRANTS TOWARDS ASSISTANCE FOR STUDENTS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR DISABILITIES AT PLUMPTON COLLEGE. ASSISTANCE WITH COURSE FEES. ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO THE INTERESTS OF STUDENTS AND EX-STUDENTS OF PLUMPTON COLLEGE. STUDENTS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN APPROVED CASES.
Area of benefit
PLUMPTON COLLEGE IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLUMPTON COLLEGE
DITCHLING ROAD
PLUMPTON
LEWES
BN7 3AE
- Phone:
- 01273890454
- Email:
- accounts@plumpton.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window