THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S SCHOOL - WALWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Peter's School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 11 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudette Farray-Green | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE BAHLOL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £450 | £0 | £4.86k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £450 | £0 | £3.92k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL FOR WHICH NO PROVISION IS MADE FROM PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters C of E Primary School
Liverpool Grove
LONDON
SE17 2HH
- Phone:
- 02077034881
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window