Financial history SHREE NAVYUG JAIN PRAGATI MANDAL

Charity number: 284739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.20k £36.30k £33.90k £80.55k £56.81k
Total expenditure £22.83k £16.50k £19.86k £60.73k £64.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A