Governing document THE HAMPSHIRE GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH APRIL 1982 AS AMENDED ON 8TH NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 1998 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 10 Oct 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY RESEARCH. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE SOCIETY MAY: (A) COLLECT, PUBLISH, CO-ORDINATE AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE IN THE INTERESTS OF FAMILY HISTORY ANY DOCUMENTS OR RECORDS PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE. (B) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PRESENTATION OF SUCH DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS. (C) HOLD LECTURES, OUTINGS, MEETINGS AND DISCUSSIONS, GIVE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE AND ISSUE PUBLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.