Financial history ANGLO-INDIAN CIRCLE LIMITED

Charity number: 284745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £111.44k £329.86k £178.40k £127.58k £140.22k
Total expenditure £123.95k £195.39k £163.84k £159.59k £150.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £33.84k N/A N/A