CLEEVE CHORALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of choral and other music. This is done in three ways, Concerts, working with the local Community and Primary School and Choir Tours
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 June 1982: Standard registration
- BISHOPS CLEEVE CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- CLEEVE CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Henry Aplin | Chair | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hunt | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Day | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Strachan | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Ernest Taylor | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Dee | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £3.73k | £10.08k | £9.69k | £9.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.02k | £5.92k | £9.44k | £9.09k | £9.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 1986, 5TH JUNE 1990 AND 18TH APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL AND OTHER MUSIC BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS 2) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Selborne Road
Bishops Cleeve
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 8BT
- Phone:
- 01242674114
- Email:
- info@cleevechorale.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window