THE MELTON OLD CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open days, morning market, evensong (one), carol service, 2 lectures or musical evenings, art group holds classes, building maybe rented for community, education or Christian purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Robert Hutchison | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ELSOM DOWSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DUCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOE ELIZABETH GREENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | 29/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £6.45k | £4.97k | £7.15k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £4.11k | £3.99k | £608 | £5.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 26TH APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
TO HOLD, MAINTAIN UP-KEEP EQUIP AND IMPROVE MELTON ST. ANDREW OLD CHURCH AT MELTON WOODBRIDGE SUFFOLK AND USE IT FOR CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY OR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(B)).
Area of benefit
MELTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 OLD BARRACK ROAD
WOODBRIDGE
IP12 4ED
- Phone:
- 01394386321
- Email:
- carol@ducelink.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window