WALTON ON THE NAZE AND DISTRICT UNIT 473 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 284797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Youth training and character building adventurous activities for Sea Cadets including RYA sail training and the Duke of Edinburgh Award Scheme.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,209
Total expenditure: £23,454

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T.S. ILLUSTRIOUS (Working name)
  • WALTON SEA CADETS (Working name)
  • SEA CADET CORPS - WALTON-ON-THE-NAZE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penelope Smith Chair 14 June 2022
None on record
Gary Pope Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Julie Pope Trustee 25 May 2019
None on record
Margaret Andrews Trustee 13 September 2016
None on record
Rosemary Hatt Trustee 01 July 2007
None on record
Simon Berry Trustee 01 January 2007
None on record
CHRISTOPHER ADAIR POWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.89k £23.37k £22.94k £15.30k £41.21k
Total expenditure £34.29k £24.71k £17.66k £26.52k £23.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.62k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stoneycroft Barn
Wigboro Wick Lane
St. Osyth
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO16 8ER
Phone:
0797413294