Trustees WALTON ON THE NAZE AND DISTRICT UNIT 473 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 284797

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Smith | Chair | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Pope | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Pope | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Andrews | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hatt | Trustee | 01 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
Simon Berry | Trustee | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ADAIR POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.