THE MALLESON MEMORIAL FUND OF THE BRITISH STUDENT HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 1982: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 15 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
1. TO ESTABLISH A REGULAR MEMORIAL LECTURE AT THE BRITISH STUDENT HEALTH ASSOCIATION'S CONFERENCES FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ORIGINAL WORK FROM THE YOUNGER MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH STUDENT HEALTH ASSOCIATION. 2. TO ESTABLISH A COLLECTION OF COUNSELLING STUDIES TO BE KNOWN AS THE MALLESTON COLLECTION AND SITUATED IN THE ALAN ROOK LIBRARY. 3. TO RAISE, HOLD, MANAGE AND EXPAND FUNDS FOR THE FOREGOING PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window