Financial history BHT SUSSEX

Charity number: 284839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.30m £13.75m £14.98m £16.94m £17.84m
Total expenditure £12.17m £13.37m £14.63m £16.85m £17.62m
Income from government contracts £1.51m £1.93m £5.96m £6.89m £7.90m
Income from government grants £152.70k £192.54k £286.85k £262.20k £248.01k
Income - Donations and legacies £188.86k £150.74k £146.95k £165.08k £184.11k
Income - Other trading activities £138.57k £130.26k £156.81k £39.81k £57.15k
Income - Charitable activities £11.96m £13.47m £14.67m £16.73m £16.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.64k £5.21k £1.32k £13.29k £47.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £414.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.12m £13.34m £14.62m £16.83m £17.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.96k £32.68k £10.45k £17.06k £22.22k
Expenditure - Governance £39.94k £55.88k £77.34k £0 £75.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0