BHT SUSSEX

Charity Number: 284839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

BHT's Mission, delivered through its services, is aimed at combating homelessness, creating opportunities and promoting change. Since the 1960s BHT has developed a range of services to meet the needs of homeless, insecurely housed and vulnerable men and women. Our services aim to tackle both the causes and effects of homelessness and poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • B H T (Working name)
  • BHT (Previous name)
  • BRIGHTON HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
  • BRIGHTON HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KELVIN MACDONALD Chair 11 December 2017
BHT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Lee Davies Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Mary Davies Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Angeline Walker Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Andrew Rose Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Lawrence Santcross Trustee 13 December 2021
SURREY YOUTH FOCUS
Received: On time
Paul Featherstone Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Gerald Main Trustee 03 December 2018
None on record
MELANIE JANE HOLLAND DAVIS Trustee 11 December 2017
FRIENDS OF ST ANN'S WELL GARDENS, HOVE
Received: On time
SARAH BUTLER Trustee 11 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.30m £13.75m £14.98m £16.94m £17.84m
Total expenditure £12.17m £13.37m £14.63m £16.85m £17.62m
Income from government contracts £1.51m £1.93m £5.96m £6.89m £7.90m
Income from government grants £152.70k £192.54k £286.85k £262.20k £248.01k
Income - Donations and legacies £188.86k £150.74k £146.95k £165.08k £184.11k
Income - Other trading activities £138.57k £130.26k £156.81k £39.81k £57.15k
Income - Charitable activities £11.96m £13.47m £14.67m £16.73m £16.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.64k £5.21k £1.32k £13.29k £47.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £414.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.12m £13.34m £14.62m £16.83m £17.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.96k £32.68k £10.45k £17.06k £22.22k
Expenditure - Governance £39.94k £55.88k £77.34k £0 £75.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £20.93m £21.42m £22.17m £22.84m £22.79m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £4.27m £4.81m £8.21m £8.60m £4.91m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £15.20m £15.20m £18.99m £19.96m £16.01m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRIGHTON HOUSING TRUST
144 LONDON ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN1 4PH
Phone:
01273645400