CHELMSFORD CROSSROADS - CARING FOR CARERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chelmsford Crossroads - Caring for Carers has ceased to operate and has passed the balance of funds, some furniture and a photocopier to Chelmsford Essex Crossroads - Caring for Carers Limited Registered charity number 1103515. The new crossroads has taken over accounting and other records from the old Crossroads and will be responsible for keeping those records safely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 17 June 1982: Standard registration
- 26 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHELMSFORD CROSSROADS (Working name)
- CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (CHELMSFORD BOROUGH) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.72k | £1.68k | £1.53k | £916 | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.15k | £1.30k | £2.52k | £36.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 February 2008 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 18 November 2007 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 March 2005 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 29TH MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED 7TH MAY 1982 AS REPLACED BY CONSTITUTION OF 2ND JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN (THE CHELMSFORD DISTRICT) (A) THE CONDITION OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PARAPLEGIA, TETRAPLEGIA, MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR OTHER CHRONIC AND DISABLING CONDITION OR ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF HOME CARE ATTENDANTS FOR SUCH PERSONS TO ASSIST THE FAMILIES OR PERSONS RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE OF SUCH PERSONS; (B) AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE TO PROVIDE SUCH HOME CARE ATTENDANTS FOR SUCH DISABLED PERSONS LIVING ALONE.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window