ABERCONWY TALKING NEWSPAPER
Charity Number: 284848
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a Talking Newspaper
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 September 2022
Total income: £293
Total expenditure: £6,540
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Conwy
Governance
Registration history:
- 10 August 1982: Standard registration
- 03 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1101117 ANTIOCH (NORTH WALES)
- 03 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1048017 CENTRE OF SIGN-SIGHT-SOUND (Y GANOLFAN ARWYDDO-GOL...
- 03 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1151513 TAPE COMMUNITY MUSIC AND FILM
- 03 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1068565 VISION ENHANCEMENT SERVICES
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- ABERCONWY TALKING NEWSPAPER (ATN) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/09/2018 | 17/09/2019 | 17/09/2020 | 17/09/2021 | 17/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £2.52k | £2.65k | £1.57k | £293 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.51k | £7.73k | £6.08k | £7.11k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR OF THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window