FRIENDS OF ALTON ABBEY

Charity Number: 284876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support the charitable work of Alton Abbey by inviting and receiving funds in the form of subscriptions, donations, and organising fundraising events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,730
Total expenditure: £538

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNNE WILMA RAPSON Chair
None on record
Francis Mary Childs Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
William Andrew Trotter Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
Rev Jane Elizabethh Leese Trustee 11 July 2018
None on record
Gill Fleming Trustee 11 July 2017
None on record
REV Simon Douglas Lane Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record
Emma Brook Trustee 11 July 2015
None on record
Rev GILES HILL OSB ex-officio Trustee 17 January 2014
None on record
Dr JILL HURLEY Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record
DENNIS IAN CHANDLER Trustee 14 July 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS A BECKET, WARBLINGTON WITH ST JAMES, EMSWORTH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.42k £12.65k £10.85k £7.87k £20.73k
Total expenditure £29.04k £5.95k £1.96k £3.40k £538
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
81 Havant Road
Emsworth
PO10 7LE
Phone:
01243430022