THE MUDCHUTE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Green Heart of East London, managing 32 acres of metropolitan green space as a country park; providing environmental education for children and youth especially the disadvantaged; equestrian centre, rare breeds of farm animals and poultry, childrens nursery; cafe and shop; training opportunities for long term unemployed; volunteering opportunities galore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,746,842
Donations and legacies | £218.94k | |
Charitable activities | £1.37m | |
Other trading activities | £153.50k | |
Investments | £2.81k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,710,856
Raising funds | £40.43k | |
Charitable activities | £1.67m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £61,275 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £40.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.67m | |
Retained for future use | £35.99k |
People

61 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
1040 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Greenwich
- Hackney
- Kent
- Lewisham
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 28 July 1982: Standard registration
- MUDCHUTE PARK AND FARM (Working name)
- THE MUDCHUTE ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mortimer | Chair | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Diane Clark | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Tara Joseph | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Martin Young | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Tahira Webb | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY GRAY | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MARGARET ROSE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||
RAYMOND JOHN SWINDELLS | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58m | £1.47m | £1.66m | £1.77m | £1.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60m | £1.44m | £1.85m | £1.51m | £1.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £516.06k | £181.41k | £73.58k | £61.28k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £278.70k | £326.55k | £748.32k | £498.35k | £218.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £174.13k | £26.08k | £12.93k | £8.03k | £153.50k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £616.16k | £834.57k | £1.12m | £1.37m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £98.25k | £35.79k | £65.28k | £143.46k | £2.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.36k | £468.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £28.07k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.27m | £1.19m | £1.74m | £1.50m | £1.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £301.01k | £226.94k | £14.78k | £15.08k | £40.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £15.47k | £13.80k | £14.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £28.25k | £23.15k | £99.65k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £513.22k | £496.67k | £464.86k | £657.94k | £662.27k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £298.78k | £340.18k | £205.47k | £320.57k | £369.04k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £124.57k | £116.17k | £138.21k | £177.65k | £194.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/02/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE THE AREA KNOWN AS THE MUDCHUTE, THE ISLE OF DOGS, LONDON, E14 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ISLE OF DOGS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN PERPETUITY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(A) OF THE MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (THE ISLE OF DOGS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mudchute Farm & Park
Pier Street
Isle of Dogs
LONDON
E14 3HP
- Phone:
- 02075155901
- Email:
- info@mudchute.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window