Trustees THE BROUGHTON AND MOTTISFONT COMMUNITY BUS COMMITTEE
Charity number: 284910

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Miles | Chair | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Mann | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Morrison | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Moore | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Illingworth | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Barnett | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Allsop-Seward | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MASON | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.