THE SALISBURY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the public in the study and art of music with special reference to liturgical and organ music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 June 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN HALLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Robson | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart David Robson | Trustee |
|
||||||
John Radford | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANCES MARY PATRICIA HOWARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD BONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM EDWARD ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN GORDON DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ARTHUR FRANK WESLEY WILLOUGHBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE MARGARET BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £698 | £1.46k | £1.62k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.83k | £665 | £922 | £1.84k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND MAY 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE ART AND MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGANIC MUSIC. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE RULES AND CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SALISBURY AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 UPPER STREET
SALISBURY
SP2 8LY
- Phone:
- 01722421882
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
iao.org.uk/salisbury
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window