Financial history THE JOHN OLDACRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 284960
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £168.11k £144.15k £161.03k £157.51k £161.78k
Total expenditure £221.58k £246.08k £243.71k £226.46k £184.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0