43RD OXFORD (ST NICHOLAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting across three section with SAS. Activities include weekly patrol meetings, camps, jumble sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 1982: Standard registration
- 43RD OXFORD (ST NICHOLAS) OLD MARSTON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Billaal Afzal-Khan | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Timothy Martin Bond Greaves | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Keith Broadfoot | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Stephen Kennedy | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Carol Phillips | Trustee | 30 June 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.03k | £16.55k | £19.71k | £16.27k | £27.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.38k | £10.64k | £13.68k | £20.86k | £32.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF INSTRUCTING BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HARBERTON MEAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 0DB
- Phone:
- 01865308348
- Email:
- 43rdtreasurer@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window