THE PEAK CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE MANAGE A DAY CENTRE - LIPHOOK DAY CENTRE 3 DAYS A WEEK FOR 50 WEEKS A YEAR. THIS PROVIDES UP TO 18 ELDERLY RESIDENTS DAILY A GOOD LUNCH, COOKED ON THE PREMISES, OTHER REFRESHMENTS, GAMES AND ENTERTAINMENT, AND MOST IMPORTANTLY, CONTACT WITH OTHER PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 July 1982: Standard registration
- 29 August 2023: Funds received from 1099089 THE FRIENDS OF LIPHOOK DAY CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Jeanette Kirby | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNIFER KNIGHT | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Pauline Murdoch | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Knox | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Hilder | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs J BUCKETT | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs L Morton | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mrs A Hall | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR D J Lush | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.48k | £77.64k | £62.56k | £69.10k | £88.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.69k | £46.54k | £61.96k | £72.30k | £80.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.50k | £27.40k | £16.12k | £14.50k | £15.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH MAY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF AND CARE FOR THE AGED AND HANDICAPPED IN THE PARISH OF BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK.("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE SAID MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Peak Centre
Midhurst Road
LIPHOOK
GU30 7TN
- Phone:
- 01428 724941
- Email:
- jbuckett@jmbaccounting.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window