Governing document INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF HYDROGRAPHIC SOCIETIES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 6 SEPT 1984,16 DEC 1986,7 OCT 1987, 19 DEC 1990, AND 1 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE OF SURVEYING AT SEA AND RELATED SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGIES; TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR MEETINGS AND A CHANNEL FOR CORRESPONDENCE AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION BETWEEN TECHNOLOGISTS AND OTHERS ENGAGED OR INTERESTED IN HYDROGRAPHY AND RELATED SCIENCES; TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF SUCH SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGIES IN ALL OR ANY OF THEIR ASPECTS; AND TO ACCUMULATE, EXTEND AND DISSEMINATE AMONGST THE MEMBERS OF THE FEDERATION AND OTHERS INFORMATION, KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE RELATING THERETO IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AN INTERNATIONAL FRAMEWORK TO SUPPORT THE NATIONAL HYDROGRAPHIC SOCIETIES IN ACHIEVING THEIR AIMS AND TO CO-ORDINATE THEIR ACTIVITIES AIMED AT THE INTERNATIONAL HYDROGRAPHIC COMMUNITY; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR INTENDING TO ENGAGE IN THE STUDY OF HYDROGRAPHY AND RELATED SCIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.