ENGLISH COUNCIL OF THE RAMABAI MUKTI MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of assistance by food, shelter and moral training (in accordance with the evangelical teachings of the Old and New Testaments of the Christian Bible) for widows, deserted wives, orphan girls and other underprivileged peoples in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 15 July 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ASHTON | Chair | 09 May 2015 |
|
|||||
GEETA ASHTON | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Abraham | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN POPPLESTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH SISSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.09k | £27.59k | £35.92k | £38.63k | £18.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £25.21k | £40.94k | £88.99k | £20.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MAY 1982
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PANDITA RAMABAI MUKTI MISSION OF KEDGAON, PUNE, MAHARASHTRA, INDIA.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 GODDARD AVENUE
SWINDON
SN1 4HS
- Phone:
- 01793 529702
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window