ABBERTON AND LANGENHOE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a village hall used for the following activities:- Dance classes, carpet bowls, craft sessions, dog training, parent toddler group, and private functions such as weddings, childrens parties, education and other functions mostly related to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 06 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JOHN FROST | Chair |
|
||||||
Philip John Creamer | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Waterhouse | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Rebecca Turrell | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allen David Martin | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Richard hobden | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Allen Turrell | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dexter John Slatter | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Perrin | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Palmer-Slatter | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.42k | £7.23k | £9.13k | £24.14k | £30.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.53k | £9.90k | £8.55k | £20.00k | £26.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 6TH DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ABBERTON AND LANGENHOE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF ABBERTON AND LANGENHOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winstree Cottage
Peldon Road
Abberton
COLCHESTER
CO5 7NX
- Phone:
- 07484728036
- Email:
- MIKEPERRIN62@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window