THE JACK PEERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION OF CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 August 1982: Standard registration
- THE JACK PEERS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES OLIVER PEERS | Chair |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE CONNELLY | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
COLIN FRANK HESSEY | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES PEERS | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.05k | £350 | £5.12k | £635 | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.51k | £138 | £4.08k | £1.21k | £7.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MAY 1982 AND SCHEME OF 09 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
(A) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH PEERS SCHOOL OXFORD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. (B) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR FOUNDATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR CLOSE
CUDDESDON
OXFORD
OX44 9HG
- Phone:
- 01844279869
- Email:
- COLINHESSEY@BTCONNECT.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window