WINCHESTER DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 285043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Amateur dramatics society

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £151,676
Total expenditure: £60,162

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CHESIL THEATRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Jane Danby Chair 31 October 2020
None on record
Zoe Daphne Snow Trustee 25 October 2024
None on record
Terrance Gregory Lohr Trustee 27 October 2023
None on record
Peter Mervyn Liddiard Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
Sarah Natalie Jacobs Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
Joanne Tracey Ashwell Trustee 31 October 2020
None on record
DAVID ROGER JAMES Trustee 19 September 2014
WINCHESTER GOOD NEIGHBOURS
Recently registered
MARTIN HUMPHREY Trustee 03 October 2011
None on record
DAVID SMALL Trustee 23 August 2011
None on record
PETER GLYN BATESON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75.57k £36.81k £122.26k £127.53k £151.68k
Total expenditure £56.21k £20.39k £36.72k £46.04k £60.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £13.21k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chesil Theatre
Chesil Street
WINCHESTER
SO23 0HU
Phone:
01962 867086