Financial history BANGLADESH ISLAMIC CENTRE ST ALBANS

Charity number: 285054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £80.15k £37.23k £96.49k £84.48k £89.71k
Total expenditure £65.16k £47.14k £128.92k £99.95k £69.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.20k N/A N/A N/A