Financial history 1ST ARLESEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 285064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.36k £27.74k £42.61k £33.87k £53.41k
Total expenditure £32.67k £9.03k £51.45k £27.47k £62.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.00k £19.74k N/A N/A