Financial history CHARLTON TOY LIBRARY

Charity Number: 285099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.34k £62.71k £38.29k £44.24k £51.92k
Total expenditure £27.94k £38.70k £39.17k £48.42k £50.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k £5.13k £5.70k