THE FRIENDS OF THE LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Charity is the advancement of public education in the history of transport and in particular by assisting and encouraging the work and activities of London Transport Museum including work and activities carried out jointly or in co-operation with any other Museum, Art Gallery, Preservation Society or similar organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 August 1982: Standard registration
- 15 May 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 May 2020: Funds transferred to 1185277 LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM FRIENDS
- THE FRIENDS OF LONDONS TRANSPORT MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.91k | £110.19k | £300.92k | £140.83k | £139.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.80k | £119.75k | £143.81k | £239.86k | £190.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 29 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 29 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 13 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 13 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 08 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 08 August 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF TRANSPORT, AND IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING AND ENCOURAGING THE WORK AND ACTIVITIES OF LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM, INCLUDING WORK AND ACTIVITY CARRIED OUT JOINTLY OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY OTHER MUSEUM ART GALLERY PRESERVATION SOCIETY OR SIMILAR ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window