FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH, ROPLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Association are the preservation, repair, restoration, improvement and ornamentation of the fabric of St Peter's Church, Ropley and to provide articles for use in worship there. The Friends also can assist in the upkeep and improvement of the Ropley Coffee Room.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 July 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Flory | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Drewienkiewicz | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BONNER | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Flatt | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pakenham-Walsh | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wood | Trustee | 01 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.69k | £42.00k | £13.78k | £8.01k | £7.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.65k | £65.16k | £40.10k | £591 | £5.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2011
Charitable objects
(A) THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH AND TO PROVIDE ARTICLES FOR USE IN WORSHIP THERE. (B) TO ASSIST THE VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS IN THE UPKEEP AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHURCH COFFEE ROOM. (C) THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCHYARD AND GRAVEYARD (AND ANY EXTENSION THEREOF), ITS BOUNDARIES AND ACCESSES;THE LOPPING, FELLING AND PLANTING OF TREES IN THE CHURCHYARD; THE PROVISION OF LIGHTING (INCLUDING FLOODLIGHTING) AND THE NECESSARY CABLING THEREOF
Area of benefit
ROPLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Parkstone Road
Ropley
ALRESFORD
Hampshire
SO24 0EW
- Phone:
- 01962772668
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window